HI SB2100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of assault in the second degree to include intentionally or knowingly causing bodily injury to certain medical services providers and staff. (SD1)
Title
Assault; Medical Services Providers; Medical Services Staff
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 11:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2253) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-10-12 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to HTH, JDL. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |