HI SB210 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 157, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 157, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Criminal Justice Data Sharing Working Group to make recommendations for a statewide criminal justice data repository. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal Justice Data Sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Act 157, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260). |
2023-06-30 | House | Act 157, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 90) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 90). |
2023-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nishimoto, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Rhoads, Kidani, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Takayama, Souza. |
2023-04-21 | House | Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Rhoads, Kidani Co-Chairs; Elefante. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Deferred one day 04-03-23. |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1629) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 104) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB100 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.