HI SB2089 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Referred to PSM/EGH.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Referred to PSM/EGH.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Act 83, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, which prohibits counties from requiring the installation of fire sprinkler systems in one- and two-family dwellings, thereby authorizing counties to adopt regulations that would require the installation of residential fire protection sprinkler systems.
Title
State Fire Council Package; Public Safety; Fire Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EGH. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1630 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2089&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2089_.HTM |