HI SB2088 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a provider of broadband internet access services to be transparent with network management practices, performance, and commercial terms of its broadband internet access services. Prohibits a provider of broadband internet access services from blocking lawful websites, impairing or degrading lawful internet traffic, engaging in paid prioritization, or interfering with or disadvantaging users of broadband internet access services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateThe committee on ETT deferred the measure.
2018-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 1:30PM in conference room 414.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to ETT, CPH.
2018-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback