HI SB2069 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the research, development, marketing, and conservation of ulu. (SB2069 HD1)
Title
Relating To ulu.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3). |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported from AGR/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/HED on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to AGR/HED, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 80) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2674) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriation
Breadfruit
University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources ($)
‘Ulu
Appropriation
Breadfruit
University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources ($)
‘Ulu