HI SB2067 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an inter-division program between the State Historic Preservation Division, Land Division, county burial councils, Office of Conservation and Coastal Lands, and the Office of Hawaiian Affairs that addresses the location, movement, and restoration of Hawaiian burial sites, or iwi, exposed or likely to be exposed to coastal erosion. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Burial Sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2047) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 1:00PM; CR 016 & Video Conference . |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Burial Sites
Coastal Erosion
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
State Historic Preservation Division
Burial Sites
Coastal Erosion
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
State Historic Preservation Division