HI SB2065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Residential Developers Loan Revolving Fund to be administered by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation for the purpose of enhancing credit and guaranteeing and insuring loans made by private financial institutions to developers of residential housing for sale or rent to qualified residents. Authorizes the Director of Finance to issue general obligation bonds to fund the Hawaii Residential Developers Loan Revolving Fund. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HOU/CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Credit Enhancement
Developers
GO Bonds
Hawaii Residential Developers Loan Revolving Fund
HHFDC
Housing
Loan Guarantees
Credit Enhancement
Developers
GO Bonds
Hawaii Residential Developers Loan Revolving Fund
HHFDC
Housing
Loan Guarantees