HI SB2065 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 207, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 207, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the possession or use of unmanned aerial vehicles on, in, or near state marine waters for purposes of fishing, unless permitted by the Department of Land and Natural Resources. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Fishing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 207, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 207, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Todd voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McKelvey, Quinlan voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 55-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 55-22). |
2022-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nakashima, Branco; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 5:00PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Branco, McDermott. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Rhoads, Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 598). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, McKelvey, Todd voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1919-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, McKelvey, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-29-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McKelvey, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 116) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3151) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 2:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Fishing
Prohibition
State Marine Waters
Unmanned Aerial Vehicle
Fishing
Prohibition
State Marine Waters
Unmanned Aerial Vehicle