HI SB2064 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes holding public events that celebrate Children and Youth Day to be held on state capitol grounds.
Title
Children and Youth Day and Month; Public Events; Capitol Grounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2074) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to HMS, JGO. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |