HI SB2063 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii after school program for youth within the Department of education to provide after school programs for public school and public charter school students in grades six through eight. Establishes the Hawaii after school program for youth special fund. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To After-school Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 104) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2999) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-20 10:40AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |