HI SB206 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of fines that may be assessed against a noncandidate committee for violations of organizational report requirements. Increases the amount of fines that may be assessed for violations of advertisement requirements. (SD1)
Title
Related To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB206 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.