HI SB206 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the teacher housing allowance program to provide housing assistance to teachers employed in schools in geographically isolated areas or hard-to-fill positions within the State. Appropriates funds for the program and appropriates funds for repair and maintenance of existing teacher housing. Requires the department of education to report to the legislature on teacher housing options.
Title
DOE; Teacher Housing Allowance Program; Teacher Housing Repair and Maintenance; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 1:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=206&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB206_.HTM |