HI SB2053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the installation, maintenance, management, and operation of non-chemical sunscreen dispensers on all state beaches. Allows the Department of Land and Natural Resources to contract or form a partnership with private parties to assist with the maintenance and management of sunscreen dispensers at all state beaches, as well as publicize that the mineral-based sunscreen in these dispensers is more protective of the coral reefs of the State. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2378) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Fevella. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-24 2:15PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |