HI SB2053 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fees and fines that can be used by county law enforcement agencies to combat illegal fireworks activity.
Title
Illegal Fireworks; Increased Fees and Fines
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO/WAM. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Reported from PSM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2007) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO/WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Re-Referred to PSM/TIA, JGO/WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 1/25/2010 1:45:00 PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to PSM/TIA, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |