HI SB2046 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for the Hawaii employers' mutual insurance company oversight council.
Title
Hawaii Employers' Mutual Insurance Company; Oversight Council
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2046&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2046_.HTM |