HI SB2035 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the position of executive director of the Hawaii health authority with a chair position. Appropriates an unspecified amount for operating expenses of the authority. Effective 01/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii Health Authority; Appropriation; Chair ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-17-14 2:07PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-14-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 86) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2648) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1837 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3