HI SB2033 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriation out of the emergency and budget reserve fund for the general assistance program.
Title
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund; General Assistance Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2017) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-10 1:50pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |