HI SB202 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes repeal dates for all professional and vocational regulatory programs under the professional and vocational licensing division of the department of commerce and consumer affairs. Requires the auditor to perform an evaluation of each program prior to repeal.
Title
Relating To Professional And Vocational Regulatory Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO, CPH/WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB202 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Auditor
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Professional and Vocational Licensing
Regulatory Programs
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Professional and Vocational Licensing
Regulatory Programs
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=202&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB202_.HTM |