HI SB2011 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a driver exclusion to enable a named insured to exclude specified persons from being covered under a motor vehicle insurance policy. Provides that a named insured that has rejected in writing the offer of uninsured motorist coverage under a motor vehicle insurance policy shall not be entitled to the rights of claim and action against the assigned insurer, with reference to the mandatory bodily injury liability policy for accidental harm. Disqualifies the coverage to an excluded operator of a motor vehicle for an accident out of which the excluded operator's accidental harm arose. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from TIA/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-14-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Kahele ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 1:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Referred to TIA/CPN, JDL. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Introduced. |