HI SB2010 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, CPN.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, CPN.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires builders to provide written cost estimates for residential fire sprinklers to potential buyers of all new one- and two-family dwellings. The state fire council shall provide written information on the benefits of a sprinkler system.
Title
Relating To Fire Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1477 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2010&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2010_.HTM |