HI SB2009 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Places a cap on the total amount that an insured is required to pay for an in-network purchase of a prescription insulin drug covered under a health benefit plan's formulary at $100 per thirty-day supply of that drug. Clarifies existing drug benefit and therefore is exempt from the impact assessment report. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-14SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2705) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2020-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-15SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2020-01-09SenatePending Introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1796 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback