HI SB20 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB20
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Accounting and General Services to establish and operate a child care center pilot program on Oahu for eligible children of state employees, one in or near the state capitol and one in Kapolei. Appropriates funds. Repeals on 6/30/2028. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Wakai. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Keith-Agaran. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HHS/LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB800 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB20 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB20 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.