HI SB196 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 11-410, HRS, by: (1) amending subsection (b) to provide that a person waives the right to a contested case hearing if the person fails to request a contested case hearing within 20 days of receipt of the Commission's preliminary determination; and (2) amending subsection (d) to provide that a final order of the Commission may be filed in the First Circuit Court for confirmation as a civil judgment, enforceable and collectible as any other judgment issued by the circuit courts.
Title
Relating To Orders Of The Campaign Spending Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB196 (Carry Over) 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
HB91 (Same As) 2023-06-23 - Act 120, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
HB91 (Same As) 2023-06-23 - Act 120, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=196&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB196_.HTM |