HI SB192 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a fee waiver for the issuance of a civil identification card in certain cases for a person who is homeless, provided homeless status is verified with an official letter. Mandates the examiner of drivers to collect data in instances in which fee waivers are granted due to a person's homeless status. Takes effect on 1/5/2016. (SD1)
Title
Civil Identification Card; Homeless Status; Fee Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 312) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRA/HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |