HI SB185 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Assesses a surcharge on all soft drinks sold in the State.
Title
Taxation; Soft Drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-09 3:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=185&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB185_.HTM |