HI SB178 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the exemption for dietary supplements from the deposit beverage container program; adds hard spirits, and wine containers.
Title
Deposit Beverage Container Program; Dietary Supplements
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 01-31-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=178 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB178_.HTM |