HI SB1624 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the legislature to either fund the tax credit under article VII, section 6 of the state constitution or deposit the same amount into the emergency and budget reserve "rainy day" fund. (SD1)
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Excess Funds; Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 394) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-27-09 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Tokuda. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-09 9:45am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 9:30am in conference room 211. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to WAM, JGO. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |