HI SB1612 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each county director of finance to waive certain abandoned vehicle tow, storage, and other charges, fees, and fines owed to the county.
Title
Relating To Abandoned Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1612 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to PSM/TCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1612&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1612_.HTM |