HI SB1601 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that one member of the land use commission be a farmer. (SD1)
Title
Land Use Commission; Farmer
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-10 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WTL. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2337) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WTL. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kokubun, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda, Fukunaga. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |