HI SB155 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB155

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes peer-to-peer car-sharing. Establishes the peer-to-peer car sharing surcharge tax. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Peer-to-peer Car-sharing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-16-21 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB155 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback