HI SB155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit of 30% of the actual cost, including installation, water meter, and permitting fees, of an automatic fire sprinkler system in any one- and two-family dwelling in a structure used only for residential purposes. Sunsets 6/30/2029.
Title
Relating To Fire Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB155 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM.
HB502 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
HB502 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=155&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB155_.HTM |