HI SB152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the criminal offenses for which biological evidence must be retained for a certain period following a conviction and the standards for uses of retained evidence. Establishes a process for the disposal of biological evidence earlier than the prescribed period for retention. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
Crime; Forensic Identification; DNA Analysis; Retention of Biological Evidence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 73) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 672) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-25-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-15 9:30AM in conference room CR016. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |