HI SB1516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts collaboration among all accident and health or sickness insurers, third party administrators, managed care plans, health care providers, and government agencies from state antitrust laws when the collaboration is intended to adopt uniform administrative procedures. Requires notice to be given to certain interested parties in advance of collaborative discussions. (SD2)
Title
Health Care; Administrative Procedures; Antitrust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 362) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 525) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 362) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-14-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |