HI SB148 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act 080, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act 080, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes gambling offenses among the types of offenses that are subject to the nuisance abatement laws. Exempts social gambling. (SB148 HD1)
Title
Offenses Against Public Health and Morals; Nuisance Abatement; Gambling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Act 080, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). |
2015-06-05 | House | Act 080, on 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani, Nishihara. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-15. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-27-15. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:02PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 486). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday 03-31-15, at 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |