HI SB147 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an income tax credit for development and construction costs for qualifying biofuel production facilities. Repeals 1/1/2017.
Title
Biofuel Production Facility; Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-10-11 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-11-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDT deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE/EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=147 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB147_.HTM |