HI SB1458 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1458
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Extended Producer Responsibility Program. Requires certain producers of fast-moving consumer goods to register with the Department of Health and pay an annual fee based on the amount of packaging volume the covered producer places on the market each calendar year. Provides for the deposit of fees into an Extended Producer Responsibility Special Fund. Provides for the expenditure of moneys from the Extended Producer Responsibility Special Fund for the creation of a report that assesses the resources needed to reduce the volume of packaging waste sent to landfills or power plants that burn municipal solid waste as a fuel by fifty per cent and eighty per cent by a date to be determined by rule. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Waste Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 607) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPN. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM/CPN. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM/CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1458 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN.
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Counties
Department of Health
Extended Producer Responsibility
Fast-Moving Consumer Goods
Packaging
Special Fund
Waste Reduction
Counties
Department of Health
Extended Producer Responsibility
Fast-Moving Consumer Goods
Packaging
Special Fund
Waste Reduction