HI SB1458 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a comprehensive five-year medical marijuana distribution pilot program in an unspecified county. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB1458 HD2)
Title
Medical Marijuana Compassion Center; Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 1:35PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Chun Oakland, Espero, Co-Chair(s); English, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Aquino, Keith-Agaran, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Ito, Riviere. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Cullen, Har, McKelvey, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Ching, Choy, Fontaine, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka, Ward voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka, Marumoto, Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Pine, Ward voting no and Representative(s) Har, Riviere, Wooley excused. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Souki. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6). | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Reported from HLT/PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; 3 Noes: Representative(s) M. Lee, Fontaine, Johanson; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Souki, Takai. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ching; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/PBM on Tuesday, 03-15-11 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT/PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 343) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 543) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kouchi ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HTH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 02-10-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-14-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 3:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |