HI SB1457 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the successor to a small estate to close the estate through a petition process, rather than requiring the successor to close the estate through probate. Allows the successor to obtain a court order covering both personal and real property. Applies to small estates worth $100,000 or less, where forty or more days have elapsed since the decedent passed away.
Title
Probate; Small Estate Closing by Petition Without Probate
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-14-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1457 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1457_.HTM |