HI SB1454 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a planned community association or a condominium association to pursue nonjudicial foreclosure for outstanding liens; allows an association to acquire a unit through credit bidding at auction; specifies allocation of excess rental income. (SD1)
Title
Homeowners Associations; Foreclosure
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-11-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |