HI SB1414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1414
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the judiciary or supporting agencies to establish and support a program for restorative justice in each county and inform various criminal justice representatives of the existence of the program. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Restorative Justice.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB427 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1414 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
SB1414 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1414&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1414_.HTM |