HI SB141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that disclosure of communications by an agency to the ombudsman does not waive any existing attorney-client or attorney work-product privilege pertaining to those communications. Prohibits the ombudsman from disclosing privileged communications to others.
Title
Relating To Disclosure Of Attorney-client And Attorney Work-product Privileged Communications To The Ombudsman.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB141 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB358 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 3
HB358 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=141&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB141_.HTM |