HI SB141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the John A. Burns School of Medicine to continue receiving revenues from the physician workforce assessment fee until June 30, 2027, for ongoing physician workforce assessment and planning to support the recruitment and retention of physicians in the State, particularly those in rural and medically underserved areas. (SB141 HD1)
Title
Relating To Physician Workforce Assessment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3). |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing, Woodson. |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-17. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 89) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 876) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 2:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HRE/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB428 (Same As)
SB141 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
SB141 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).