HI SB141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the authority of counties to use land-based financing to support operating costs for certain county services provided within improvement districts and community facilities districts. Adds county maintenance of the capital improvements to be land-based financed. Authorizes counties to use up to per cent of the assessment or tax revenues to cover administrative expenses in creating and administering the district and the associated assessments, fees, and taxes. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Counties; Land-Based Financing; Community Facilities District
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-12-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |