HI SB1397 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a geothermal energy pilot program that shall terminate no later than 12/1/2020. Creates an electric credit for consumers of electricity generated by geothermal energy.
Title
Renewable Energy; Geothermal Electric Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1397 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1397_.HTM |