HI SB1380 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning to update the Hawaii 2050 Sustainability Plan and submit the updated plan to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2021 and every 10th session thereafter, using the goal and priority guidelines of the State Plan and the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Initiative as guiding principles. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 466) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1165) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-19 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 656) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1380 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27