HI SB1378 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 031, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 031, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that owners of chassis used for transporting shipping containers are exempt from the requirement to keep a certificate of registration within the chassis. Authorizes these businesses to keep the original certificate of registration, motor vehicle identification card, certificate of insurance, and certificate of inspection at their principal place of business within the State and specifies that it is not a requirement to keep the original or copy of these documents on the chassis. (SB1378 HD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Act 031, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132). |
2019-04-29 | House | Act 031, on 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 897). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 5 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto, Ihara, Kidani, L. Thielen. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 567). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1983), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1332) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |