HI SB1371 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1371
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the abandonment of lay nets used for fishing. Authorizes DLNR to issue permits for the use and possession of lay nets. Requires DLNR to establish a comprehensive, statewide lay net education and enforcement program. (SB1371 HD1)
Title
Relating To Lay Nets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 870). |
2019-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 312. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 863). |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Todd, Thielen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 707). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2107), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Friday, 03-29-19 at 2:00 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-26-19 11:31AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1371 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 870).