HI SB1354 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the governing body of each county to adopt, as appropriate, more current internationally and nationally recognized codes and standards if the state building code council has not adopted new model building codes and standards as required in section 107-24, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii State Building Codes; State Building Code Council; Codes and Standards; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |