HI SB1337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to establish a block-level upzoning program to allow homeowners within a block located in an urban district to vote to increase the housing density for their respective block. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing Density.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 413) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Moriwaki. Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1337 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.