HI SB1320 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1320
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates a regenerative framework into the State Planning Act by establishing objectives and policies for the visitor industry. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Regenerative Tourism.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 408) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Riviere. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 3:30PM; CR224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1320 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22